U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Hurst et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 17, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 14, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 11, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • June 06, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 05, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 05, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Response]
  • March 29, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • March 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • December 10, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 10, 2018: [Vacate]
  • December 10, 2018: [Bifurcate]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 25, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 25, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.