U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Larson v. Brundage-Bone Concrete Pumping Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 02, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Strike]
  • October 08, 2019: [Supplement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • August 23, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 22, 2019: [Witness List]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • December 10, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • November 30, 2018: [Add Party]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2018: [Statement]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • May 29, 2018: [Complaint]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.