U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Szymanski v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Response]
  • June 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 18, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [- Ex-Parte Document]
  • June 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 14, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • May 14, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [- Ex-Parte Document]
  • May 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 18, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Letter(s)]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 04, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 01, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 18, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Staying Case]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Setting Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2018: [Response]
  • November 01, 2018: [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 18, 2018: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • October 15, 2018: [Response]
  • October 05, 2018: [Letter(s)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • September 28, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 28, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • September 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 21, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • July 19, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 04, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 04, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • June 04, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.