U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00086
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Halvorsen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Default Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 30, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • July 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • June 06, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.