U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Barr et al v. CR England Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 16, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2020: [Objection]
  • February 10, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 14, 2019: [In Court Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Strike]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Witness List]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Bifurcate]
  • October 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 25, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2019: [Supplement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 08, 2019: [In Limine]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 28, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • September 06, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 06, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 05, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 22, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 14, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 13, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 17, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 13, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.