U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Pinegar v. Uinta County District Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Closing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • June 15, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.