U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Spicers Paper Inc v. Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 08, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 05, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2018: [Vacating Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 18, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 18, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.