U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Gas Sensing Technology Corp v. Ashton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 04, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 04, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 03, 2018: [Opposition]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 19, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 19, 2018: [Reply]
  • November 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2018: [Opposition]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • August 27, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • August 14, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 14, 2018: [Opposition]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 06, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 30, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • July 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 18, 2018: [Remand]
  • July 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2018: [Quash]
  • July 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 12, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 18, 2018: [Complaint]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.