U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Villecco v. Klein et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 17, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 24, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 04, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Letter(s)]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 04, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 19, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 19, 2019: [Letter(s)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • May 15, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Opposition]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 21, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 02, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • October 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • October 22, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • August 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 31, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • July 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • June 26, 2018: [Complaint]
  • June 26, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.