U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Bin Soufayan v. 1st Investment Management LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Show Cause]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response]
  • October 01, 2018: [Show Cause]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.