U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Batton v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Letter(s)]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 28, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • January 27, 2020: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • January 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • January 14, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • January 14, 2020: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 23, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on 2255 Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Letter(s)]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Letter(s)]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Reply to Response]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Objection]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • July 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2018: [Letter(s)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 26, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 26, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.