U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Rodriquez et al v. Seckman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 19, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 05, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 30, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Praecipe]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.