U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Parker v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 28, 2018: [Vacate]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Exhibit]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 06, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 03, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.