U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Wellsite Compressor and Equipment Co LLC v. Powder River Midstream LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 11, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 07, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 02, 2018: [Jury Demand]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 18, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 09, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.