U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Campbell County Hospital District v. Express Scripts Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 13, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 22, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 29, 2019: [Vacate]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 24, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 17, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 07, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2018: [Payment Entry]
  • July 24, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2018: [Removal]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.