U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Sandoval v. G6 Hospitality, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 28, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • August 28, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • August 28, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 27, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 26, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • August 26, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • August 26, 2019: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • August 22, 2019: [Response]
  • August 22, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 14, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • August 12, 2019: [Quash]
  • August 12, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 11, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 10, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 31, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 30, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 27, 2019: [In Limine]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 16, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 27, 2018: [Vacating Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 24, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 01, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.