U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Hennessy et al v. Malewitz
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 18, 2019: [Vacate]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 16, 2019: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • October 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 12, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Strike]
  • October 04, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 16, 2019: [Proposed Verdict]
  • September 16, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Verdict]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 03, 2019: [Designation]
  • September 03, 2019: [Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Designation]
  • August 30, 2019: [Objection]
  • August 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 21, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Objection]
  • August 19, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 09, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 26, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 08, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Non-Dispositive]
  • July 02, 2019: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 17, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Protective Order]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 06, 2019: [Designation]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 19, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • August 21, 2018: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • July 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.