U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Coles v. Wind River Detention Center Acting Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 23, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response]
  • July 19, 2018: [Errata]
  • July 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • July 17, 2018: [Setting Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.