U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Westover v. United States Department of Health and Human Services Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 05, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Brief]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Response]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 16, 2019: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 22, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.