U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Whitmire v. Wolf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Quash]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 31, 2022: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Reply Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [(TRMD)Amended Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Praecipe]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Praecipe]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • January 27, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 10, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 10, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set Aside]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • January 04, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • January 04, 2022: [Set Aside]
  • January 04, 2022: [Opposition]
  • January 04, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Default]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 27, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 23, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • August 18, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 12, 2021: [Quash]
  • August 11, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2021: [Praecipe]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Response]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Brief]
  • April 29, 2020: [Lift Stay]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Staying Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Quash]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 24, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 28, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 10, 2018: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 24, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.