U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02028
  • Case Name: Royal v. Capital One Auto Finance
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compromise]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • October 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compromise]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Payment]
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.