U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02029
  • Case Name: Herrell et al v. Mosher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 13, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status Report]
  • February 22, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status Report]
  • February 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • July 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Show Cause]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • May 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • May 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Sanctions]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Sanctions]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Decision and Order]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.