U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20615
  • Case Name: Shannondoah Dawn Parry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Completion of Plan Pymts]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Approving Modification of Plan (All Chapters)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modified Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Order]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.