U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20624
  • Case Name: Bryant Boone Korber
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.