U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00122
  • Case Name: King et al v. Wyoming Highway Patrol et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 20, 2018: [Reply]
  • November 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 24, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 02, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 02, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • August 02, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.