U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20629
  • Case Name: Timothy James Hamilton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Modify Plan]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
October, 2019
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Social Security Number]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan - Case Upload]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.