U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Johnson v. EOG Resources Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Response]
  • January 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 21, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 21, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • December 23, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 23, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 23, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Statement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2019: [Designation]
  • December 06, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 16, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 07, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 07, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • July 24, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • July 03, 2019: [Response]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 20, 2019: [Response]
  • June 20, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Compel]
  • May 29, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 02, 2019: [Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Response]
  • April 11, 2019: [Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 01, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Recusal]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 02, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 22, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • August 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.