U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Oxford v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 14, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • September 18, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Recusal]
  • August 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 09, 2018: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 06, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.