U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Carter v. Pyle Transportation Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 08, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 11, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Supplement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 14, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.