U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20650
  • Case Name: Shelly Rene Nelson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
August, 2018
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.