U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Rajab v. National Oilwell Varco LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 18, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 15, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 07, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • May 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • February 22, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 21, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 05, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.