U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Woodward et al v. Parco LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Financial Entry]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 25, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 05, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • August 17, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 17, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 13, 2018: [Removal]
  • August 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 10, 2018: [Complaint]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.