U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Patton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Brief]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 27, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • October 12, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.