U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20660
  • Case Name: Bruno Val Novel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Document]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Proposed Order]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.