U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20663
  • Case Name: Gary Lee Allen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.