U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20675
  • Case Name: Jessica N. Grass
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement of Intent]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.