U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Response]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Letter(s)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Errata]
  • October 24, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 24, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2018: [Response]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response]
  • October 09, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.