U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20685
  • Case Name: Michael Gerald Josten
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Vacate]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Status Report]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auctioneers Statement of Property Sold]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Vacate]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Withdrawal]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Generic Motion]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Debtors Claim of Exemptions]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Intent]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.