U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Lundahl et al v. McKay Dee Hospital et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 28, 2018: [Removal]
  • August 27, 2018: [Recusal]
  • August 23, 2018: [Complaint]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.