U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 21, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • February 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • February 06, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • February 06, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 05, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Acceptance of Service]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.