U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Buckham v. Rife et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 28, 2020: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • July 28, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • July 27, 2020: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 22, 2020: [Response]
  • July 22, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 16, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • July 14, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 14, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • July 13, 2020: [Service of Process]
  • July 10, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Response]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Response]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Response]
  • March 16, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 10, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • March 09, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Response]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 31, 2020: [Brief]
  • January 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 31, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 10, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reply]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 25, 2019: [Compel]
  • October 25, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Reply to Response]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Response]
  • July 18, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Compel]
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Martinez Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Response]
  • July 01, 2019: [Letter(s)]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • May 23, 2019: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: [Response]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Objection]
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2018: [Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Objection]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.