U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Sullivan et al v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 11, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • February 06, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 07, 2019: [Reply to Response]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Errata]
  • August 29, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.