U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20692
  • Case Name: Ronda Michelle Fenn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2019
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Property Sold]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.