U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Box Creek Mineral Limited Partnership v. Chesapeake Exploration LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 16, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 18, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 18, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 18, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 14, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 05, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 05, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • September 04, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Removal]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Complaint]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.