U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02031
  • Case Name: Royal v. Betancourt et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compromise]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compromise]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • December 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • December 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.