U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20699
  • Case Name: Lola Gaye Coor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Exigent Circumstances re: Credit Counseling]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Social Security Number]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.