U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20704
  • Case Name: Michael E Steele
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Convert Case From 13 to 7]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Proposed Order]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Social Security Number]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Schedules A B-J]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.