U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Arctic Energy Services LLC v. Paddison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 24, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.