U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association et al v. Woods et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 07, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 17, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 17, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • September 06, 2018: [Removal]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Complaint]
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.