U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Humphries v. Chase
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 19, 2019: [Vacate]
  • April 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 01, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.